Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
21St Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by White, Leslie Singleterry, against Baker, Donald, Grice, Annie Louise, Unknown Tenant, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with Gary L. Sanders presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary L. Sanders Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryContract/Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: December 18, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 18, 2019AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY
Date: December 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT OF REPLEVIN | |
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION-MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF REPLEVIN FILED BY PLTF 21ST MORTGAGE CORP | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | WRIT OF REPLEVIN EXECUTED ON DEFT ANNIE LOUISE BAKER GRICE | |
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | WRIT OF REPLEVIN ISSUED | |
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING WRIT OF REPLEVIN AND OR WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED POSTED FOR DONALD BAKER | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED POSTED FOR ANNIE LOUISE GRICE | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED POSTED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.