Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
American Financial Resources I, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Galipault, Joanne Mary, against Jakthan Properties Llc, Johnson, Robert A Jr, Johnson, Virginia Ruth, Unknown Tenant In Possession O, represented by Mutarelli, Richard David, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with MUSLEH, VICTOR JOSEPH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMUSLEH, VICTOR JOSEPH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by American Financial Resources, Inc., a New Jersey corporation, against Robert A. Johnson Jr, Jakthan Properties, LLC, Virginia Ruth Johnson, and an unknown tenant in possession of the subject property. T...
PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: December 17, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 17, 2019EFILED LIS PENDENS
Date: December 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES INC | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES INC | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: MUSLEH , VICTOR J Assigned | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | AO 2021-29 CIVIL BACKLOG DOCKET CASE REASSIGNED TO SENIOR JUDGE - JUDGE MUSLEH | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PLTF AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES INC | |
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event | CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE | |
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT JAKTHAN PROPERTIES LLC | |
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION-MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT ENTERED FEBRUARY 6 2020 FILED BY DEFT JAKTHAN PROPERTIES LLC | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY FILED BY DEFTS ROBERT ALLEN JOHNSON JR AND VIRGINIA RUTH JOHNSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.