Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gonzalez, Wilfredo, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Plappert, Stanley W, against New Rez, represented by Esposito, Michael Roy, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with Steven G. Rogers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven G. Rogers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2019 |
CategoryOther Real Property $0-$50,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
This complaint is a motion filed by the defendant, New Rez c/o PHH Mortgage Services, requesting an enlargement of time to respond to the plaintiff's amended complaint. The plaintiff, Wilfredo Gonzalez, filed an amended complaint on June 24, 2020, an...
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 17, 2019PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: December 17, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 17, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT NEW REZ
Date: January 10, 2020MOTION-MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT NEW REZ
Date: January 10, 2020ORDER TO RESPOND-AND ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURE
Date: March 13, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: May 18, 2020AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: June 24, 2020MOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT NEWREZ
Date: February 14, 2020ORDER TO SET HEARING
Date: May 14, 2020EFILED SUMMONS
Date: December 17, 2019ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL
Date: June 16, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: June 29, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR NEW REZ
Date: December 23, 2019ORDER GRANTING MOTION-ENLARGEMENT OF TIME
Date: January 15, 2020ORDER GRANTING MOTION CONT SEE DOC
Date: June 28, 2020MOTION-MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FILED BY PLTF WILFREDO GONZALEZ
Date: May 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION-MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FILED BY PLTF WILFREDO GONZALEZ | |
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT NEW REZ | |
June 28, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION CONT SEE DOC | |
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SET HEARING | |
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE TO DEFT NEWREZ MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FILED BY PLTF WILFREDO GONZALEZ | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO RESPOND-AND ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.