Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mcmasters, Cody, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Toth, Adrienn Nikolett, against Spell, Randy Glenn, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with SANDERS, GARY LAMAR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSANDERS, GARY LAMAR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 16, 2019DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL
Date: January 17, 2020PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: December 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF CODY MCMASTERS | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE-NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST FILED BY PLTF CODY MCMASTERS | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY PLTF CODY MCMASTERS | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | WITNESS DISCLOSURE PLTF EXPERT | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO CODY MCMASTERS FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.