Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Samuel Benjamin Fuller, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cheyenne Alexis Fuller, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with DANIELLE L BREWER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDANIELLE L BREWER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2022 |
CategoryDissolution |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Compliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 9/21/2022 | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received:Receipt Number C 1074272 | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY ATTORNEY CURTIS COWAN OBO SAMUEL FULLER | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER FOR MANATEE, SARASOTA AND DESOTO COUNTIES | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHEYENNE ALEXIS FULLER ON 09/22/2022 | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO LIMITED APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | VERIFIED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITHOUT CHILDREN | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 412022DR003978DRAXMA Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.