Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Homebridge Financial Services Inc, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case represented by Justin Charles Ritchie, against Jean Morneau, Mv Realty Pbc Llc, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with CHARLES SNIFFEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHARLES SNIFFEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: September 29, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED REI V PRO LLC 6/22/2023
Date: July 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received:Receipt Number C 1193883 | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 assessed at sum $18.50 AssessmentID 12171276 | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF 11/21/2023 AT 9AM | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION FOR DEFAULT - RETURNS OF SERVICE | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | PROPOSED DEFAULT AS TO JEAN MORNEAU A/K/A JEAN H. MORNEAU A/K/A JEAN HENORIUS MORNEAU A/K/A JEANNE H. MORNEAU, RELY PRO LLC, ROYAL SERVICE SYSTEMS, LIC, MV REALTY PBC, LLC, ENTERED AUGUST 16 2023 | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTIONS FOR DEFAULT AS TO JEAN MORNEAU A/K/A JEAN H. MORNEAU A/K/A JEAN. HONORIUS MORNEAV A/K/A JEANNE H. MORNEAU, RET V PRO LLC, ROYAL SERVICE SYSTEMS, LLC, MV REALTY PBC, LLC, | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT INCLUDING A HEARING TO TAX ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.