Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
National Funding Inc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Jason Gabriel Khano, against Eddie Jr Hughes, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with CHARLES SNIFFEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHARLES SNIFFEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2022 |
CategoryForeign Judg - Ca |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Compliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 9/21/2022 | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received:Receipt Number C 1074303 | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11968091 | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Compliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 9/20/2022 - id number 2435395 | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 412022CA003979CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 9/19/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.