Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Genevieve Machiele, Paul Machiele, Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, filed a(n) case represented by Demetra Halmoukos Sims, against Greens At The Pinebrook Owners Association Inc, represented by Shaun Robert Koby, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with EDWARD NICHOLAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEDWARD NICHOLAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
COMPLAINT
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY DEMI HALMOUKOS SIMS, ESQ | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT THE GREENS AT THE PINEBROOK OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.'S, FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O PAUL AND GENEVIEVE MACHIELE | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, THE GREENS AT THE PINEBROOK OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.'S, NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O PAUL AND GENEVIEVE MACHIELE | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT THE GREENS AT THE PINEBROOK OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFE'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT THE GREENS AT THE PINEBROOK OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND ORDER | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.