Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Richard Summers, Susan Summers, filed a(n) case represented by Lashana Jenell Hamilton, against Family Security Insurance Company, represented by Maggie Eileen Potter, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with CHARLES SNIFFEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHARLES SNIFFEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: August 30, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF HEARING MONDAY, JUNE 6, 2022 AT 9:30AM EST VIA ZOOM DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS - EXHIBITS A-D COPY OF POLICY / COMPLAINT / DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT / AMENDED COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO AMENDED COMPLAINT - EXHIBIT A - MEMORANDUM OF LAW | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF UNIFIED PLAINTIFF | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF UNIFIED PLAINTIFF- GENERAL WARRANTY DEED | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF UNIFIED PLAINTIFF- EXHIBIT B- DECLARATION PAGE - WITH COPY OF POLICY - FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY / | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFFS | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS MAGGIE E POTTER ESQ OBO FAMILY SECURITY INSURANC COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.