Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) case represented by Scott Eric Modlin, against Chunshui Xie, Unique Kitchen & Bath Inc, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with EDWARD NICHOLAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEDWARD NICHOLAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
This complaint was filed by American Express National Bank, as the successor by merger to American Express Bank, FSB, against Unique Kitchen & Bath Inc. and Chunshui Xie. The complaint alleges a breach of contract and seeks damages exceeding $30,000....
COMPLAINT
Date: August 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATES REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO CIVIL MAGISTRATE | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING MARCH 30, 2022 TIME: 10:45AM VIA ZOOM PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMGENT - EXJHIBIT A- COPY OF DEAULT | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFFS AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS WITH ATTACHED CARDMEMBER AGREEMENT / ACCOUNT SUMMARY | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED ON UNIQUE KITCHEN & BATH INC., AKA UNIQUE KITCHEN AND BATH AND CHUNSHUI XIE, AKA CHUN SHUI XIE -- ENTERED 12/15/2021 | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK OF COURT AS TO UNIQUE KITCHEN & BATH INC., AKA UNIQUE KITCHEN AND BATH AND CHUNSHUI XIE, AKA CHUN SHUI XIE, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.