Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Widewaters Bradenton Llc, filed a(n) case represented by Matthew Weston Peaire, against Lucilla Maken, Ramon E Maken, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with EDWARD NICHOLAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEDWARD NICHOLAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Widewaters Bradenton, LLC, doing business as Hampton Inn and Suites, against Ramon E. Maken, also known as Ramon E. Maken, Jr., and Lucilla Maken. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the defendants, resulting in...
COMPLAINT
Date: July 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED LUCILLA MAKEN, AUGUST 19 2021 | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED RAMON E MAKEN AKA RAMON E MAKEN JR AUGUST 19 2021 | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Compliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 7/2/2021 - id number 2252970 | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Compliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 7/1/2021 | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 412021CA002720CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 7/1/2021 | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received:Receipt Number C 934739 | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11722992 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.