Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Claudia Taylor, filed a(n) case represented by Joel Patrick Williams, against Bw Solana Vista Llc, represented by Richard D Knuth, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with CHARLES SNIFFEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHARLES SNIFFEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 29, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: June 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION VIA ZOOM - CLAUDIA TAYLOR MARCH 31 2022 1:3OPM | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING BW SOLANA'S ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES - ATTY DANIEL KNUTH OBO DEFENDANT | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | BW SOLANA'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | BW SOLANA'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES R. DANIELKNUTH ESQ OBO BW SOLANA VISTA, LLC, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.