Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Myrna Rivera Rosado, filed a(n) case represented by Robert Henry Bonanno Jr, against Forest Cove Llc, represented by Evan Philip Dahdah, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with EDWARD NICHOLAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEDWARD NICHOLAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
COMPLAINT
Date: June 28, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFEF'S DEFENDANT, FOREST COVE, LLC, BY AND THROUGH THE UNDERSIGNED | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FOREST COVE, LLC | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER SETTING ASIDE CLERKS DEFAULT | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES - EVAN DAHDAH OBO FOREST COVE LLC | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED ON FOREST COVE LLC -- ENTERED 2/28/2022 | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT AS TO FOREST COVE, LLC | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED FOREST COVE LLC 7/23/2021 | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT FOREST COVE, LLC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.