Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Alessandra Vasconcellos, Fabio Vasconcellos, Fabio Vasconcellos Jr, Michel Loiselle, Sandra Loiselle, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) case represented by Christian Michael Ficarelli, against American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida, Family Security Insurance Company, represented by Amanda M Bartley, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with EDWARD NICHOLAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEDWARD NICHOLAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
PLAINTIFFSNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: June 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFFS | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFFS | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD WITHIN THE FIRM AND DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION DANIELLE M. BUTLER, ESQ. OBO FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.