Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Candia Kreitsek, Dennis Kreitsek, filed a(n) case represented by Ustena Sarwat Fam, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Naomi Danelle Bradford, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with CHARLES SNIFFEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHARLES SNIFFEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
PLAINTIFFSNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: June 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT, UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND FOR SANCTIONS VIA ZOOM WEDNESDAY, JUNE 8, 2022 AT 01:30 P.M. | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM VIA VIRTUAL PLATFORM - DEFENDANTS CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE JUNE 29 2022 1OAM | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM VIA VIRTUAL PLATFORM - ERIC WARNER JULY 6 2022 1OAM | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - EXHIBIT A - AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY REQUEST / LETTER FROM KELLEY KRONENBERG DATED MARCH 9, 2022 | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND FOR SANCTIONS | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - CANDIA KREITSEK AND DENNIS KREITSEK JUNE 21 2022 1OAM VIA ZOOM | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPONDE TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY REQUESTS | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS) | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S, NOTICE OF SERVING ITS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DENNIS KREITSEK AND CANDIA KREITSEK | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S, FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFFS DENNIS KREITSEK AND CANDIA KREITSEK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.