Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Barnes Walker Title Inc, filed a(n) case represented by Kristina Hager Snyderman, against 448 Holdings Llc, Managed Investment Holdings Llc, represented by Christopher Cecil Morrison, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with EDWARD NICHOLAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEDWARD NICHOLAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
This complaint is a filing for interpleader by Barnes Walker Title, Inc., a Florida profit corporation, against Managed Investment Holdings, LLC, a Florida limited liability company, and 448 Holdings, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company. The com...
COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER
Date: June 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO CIVIL MAGISTRATE | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S, MANAGED INVESTMENT HOLDINGS, LLC'S, OBJECTION TO NON-PARTY PRODUCTION | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE AND REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S, MANAGED INVESTMENT HOLDINGS, LLC'S, FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO CO-DEFENDANT, 448 HOLDINGS, LLC | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S, MANAGED INVESTMENT HOLDINGS, LLC'S, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S, MANAGED INVESTMENT HOLDINGS, LLC'S, FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO CIVIL MAGISTRATE | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S, MANAGED INVESTMENT HOLDINGS, LLC, ANSWER TO CO-DEFENDANT'S, 448 HOLDINGS, LLC, CROSS CLAIM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.