Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Paul J Keyes, filed a(n) case represented by David Michael Borrego, against Auto Owners Insurance Company, represented by William Scott Hamilton, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with EDWARD NICHOLAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEDWARD NICHOLAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by the Plaintiff, Paul J. Keyes, against the Defendant, Auto-Owners Insurance Company. The Plaintiff is seeking damages that exceed $30,000, exclusive of costs, interest, and attorneys' fees. The estimated value of the Plainti...
COMPLAINT
Date: June 25, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL OF RECORD TO AN ATTORNEY WITHIN THE SAME FIRM AND E-MAIL DESIGNATION DAVID M. BORREGO, ESQUIRE OBO PAUL J. KEYES, | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | FIFTH NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT/AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY'S FOURTH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFE | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFEF'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT/AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF SERVING SECOND SET INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT/AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY'S THIRD REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | FOURTH NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT/AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY'S SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE A. CROSBY CRANE ESQ OF THE FIRM OF MORGAN & MORGAN OBO PAUL J. KEYES | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | THIRD NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.