Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Arbors At Pinebrook Owners Association Inc, filed a(n) case represented by Robert Lawrence Todd, against Jean Worth, Melvern Worth, M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with EDWARD NICHOLAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEDWARD NICHOLAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by The Arbors at Pinebrook Owner's Association, Inc., a Florida not-for-profit corporation, against the defendants Melvern Worth, Jean Worth, and M&l Marshall & ILSLEY BANK. The action is based on a claim ...
COMPLAINT
Date: June 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $9.00 AssessmentID 11765143 | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received:Receipt Number C 958148 | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS- NOT RECORDED FEE NOT PAID | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A CERTIFICATE OF AMENDMENT AMENDED AND RESTATED DECLARATION OF CONDOMINIUM OF THE ARBORS AT PINEBROOK, A CONDOMINIUM THE ARBORS AT PINEBROOK OWNER'S ASSOCIATION, INC. / EXHIBIT B CLAIM OF LIEN FOR CONDOMINIUM ASSESSMENTS / EXHIBIT C NOTICE OF INTENT TO RECORD A CLAIM OF LIEN / EXHIBIT D DELINQUENT ASSESSMENT | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: MELVERN WORTH / JEAN WORTH / M&I MARSHALL & ILSLEY BANK - JUNE 25 2021 | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received:Receipt Number C 932706 | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 412021CA002602CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 6/24/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.