Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Joann Klinetop, Robert Klinetop, filed a(n) case represented by Liz Marie Feliz, against St Johns Insurance Company Inc, represented by Andrew Bernard Jaffe, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with CHARLES SNIFFEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHARLES SNIFFEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Robert Klinetop and Joann Klinetop against St. Johns Insurance Company, Inc. The plaintiffs are seeking damages exceeding $30,000, exclusive of interest, costs, and attorney's fees. The defendant is an insurance company aut...
PLAINTIFFSNOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 24, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: June 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS PRIVILEGE LOG IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT?'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - EXHIBIT A- REASSIGNMENT OF INSURANCE BENEFITS /AUDIT TRAIL | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANTS DESIGNATED CORPORATE RESPRESENTATIVE - DATE FEBRUARY 9 2022 1OAM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.