Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bryan Santana Arenas, Eusebia Santana Blas, Karla Santana Arenas, filed a(n) case represented by Zachary Christian Cole, against Richard Thomas Farrior, represented by Jody Michael Valdes, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with EDWARD NICHOLAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEDWARD NICHOLAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
COMPLAINT
Date: January 15, 2021PLAINTIFF EUSEBIA SANTANA BLAS'S INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT RICHARD THOMAS FARRIOR
Date: January 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATION ATTENDANCE AND CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION - AUGUST 10 2022 1PM | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION TO COMPEL - EXHIBIT A DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF EUSEBIA SANTANA BLAS / EXHIBIT B DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF BRYAN SANTANA ARENAS / EXHIBIT C EMAIL | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, RICHARD THOMAS FARRIOR'S, MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS'? RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR. COPIES | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF ELSEBIA SANTANA BLAS | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - EXHIBIT A-E -- COPY OF SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION / CERTIFICATES OF NON - APPEARANCE | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FORM NON-PARTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.