Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) case represented by Benjamin J Lefrancois, against Charles R Wells, Manatee County Sheriffs Office, represented by 600 Highway 301 Blvd West Suite 202 Bradenton Fl 34205, Whittni Marie Hodges, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with CHARLES SNIFFEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHARLES SNIFFEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
PROPERTY DAMAGE AND UNINSURED MOTORIST SUBROGATION COMPLAINT
Date: January 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR STAY - PENDING RESOLUTION OF MANATEE COUNTY CASE 2022 CA 602 | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR STAY | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT RICK WELLS, SHERIFF OF MANATEE COUNTY'S SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO REQUEST FO PRODUCTION EXHIBIT A- AUTHORIZATIONS FOR RELEASE OF PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT' S INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | RICK WELLS, SHERIFF OF MANATEE COUNTY'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - EXHIBIT A- PREMIUM NOTICE/ COPY OF POLICY/ | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.