Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Reed Neighbors, filed a(n) case represented by Jonathan Isaac Rotstein, against Joseph Tino, J Tino Concrete Inc, represented by Katherine Virginia Shadwick, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with EDWARD NICHOLAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEDWARD NICHOLAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
This complaint was filed by Reed Neighbors against Joseph Tino and J. Tino Concrete, Inc. in the Circuit Court, Twelfth Judicial Circuit, in and for Manatee County, Florida. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of both defendants. Reed Neighb...
PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT
Date: January 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE FROM ATTORNEY | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF CLAIM | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.