Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
James Casto, James Casto Revocable Trust 07 23 1993, filed a(n) case represented by James Christopher Turffs, against Joan Richardson, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with EDWARD NICHOLAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEDWARD NICHOLAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by James Casto, as Trustee of the James Casto Revocable Trust, against Defendant Joan Richardson. The action concerns a real property located at 6101 34th Street West, #26G, Bradenton, Florida. The complaint seeks to reform a ...
COMPLAINT
Date: January 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTSANSWER | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO DEFENDANTS ANSWER / EXHIBIT A - COPY OF QUITCLAIM DEED | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED JOAN RICHARDSON, JANUARY, 14 2021 | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11634561 | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - COPY OF QUACIAIM DEED | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Compliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 1/13/2021 - id number 2189480 | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received:Receipt Number C 883469 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.