Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Linda Figueroa, filed a(n) case represented by Courtney Isop Flandreau, Patrick C Chucri, against Hector L Lopez Ortiz, Maria E Perez Garcia, represented by Tammy-Mary Baldwin Denbo, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with CHARLES SNIFFEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHARLES SNIFFEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO: HECTOR L. LOPEZ ORTIZ
Date: January 11, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO: MARIA E. PEREZ GARCIA
Date: January 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION AS TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES THROUGH NON-PARTY SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES THROUGH NON-PARTY SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS, HECTOR L. LOPEZ ORTIZ AND MARIA E. PEREZ GARCIA'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLANTIFF, LINDA FIGUEROA'S, REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF - ATTY PATRICK CHUCRI OBO PLAINTIFF | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF NO OBEJECTION AS TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.