Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gary Justus, Sandra Justus, filed a(n) case represented by M David Shapiro, against Carey Mccoy, Geico General Insurance Company, represented by K Grace Kobitter, Michael Robert Wallace, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with EDWARD NICHOLAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEDWARD NICHOLAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed in the Circuit Court of the Twelfth Judicial Circuit in Manatee County, Florida. The plaintiffs, Gary Justus and Sandra Justus, are suing the defendants, Carey McCoy and GEICO General Insurance Company, for damages. The compla...
COMPLAINT
Date: January 07, 2021NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, CAREY MCCOY
Date: January 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION CAREY MCCOY DATE AND TIME; WEDNESDAY, DECEMBER 29, 2021, AT 10:00 A.M, | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT CAREY MCCOY'S THIRD REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT CAREY MCCOY'S NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF SANDRA JUSTUS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES SECTION 768.79 AND FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.442 | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT CAREY MCCOY'S NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF GARY JUSTUS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES SECTION 768.79 AND FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.442 | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR TRIAL | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT CAREY MCCOY'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE FOR TRIAL AND REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT CAREY MCCOYS THIRD REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF GARY JUSTUS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.