Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Gte Federal Credit Union Dba G, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mason, Michelle Karen, against Collis, Gloria Louise, Gte Federal Credit Union Dba G, Town Of Lee Florida, Unknown Tenant, represented by Mullin, Hillary Renee, Rabin, Kevin Skyler, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with OLIN, MELISSA GATES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOLIN, MELISSA GATES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2019NTC OF LIS PENDENS
Date: April 12, 2019AFFD AS TO AMTS DUE AND OWING
Date: April 12, 2019ISSUED SUMMONS GLORIA COLLIS
Date: April 12, 2019ISSUED SUMMONS GTE FEDERAL
Date: April 12, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 12, 2019NOTICE OF FILING
Date: April 12, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE GTE
Date: May 01, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE TOWN OF LEE
Date: May 01, 2019ISSUED SUMMONS TOWN OF LEE
Date: April 12, 2019ISSUED SUMMONS UNKNOWN TENANT
Date: April 12, 2019PTLIF'S NOTICE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: June 21, 2019PTLIF'S WITNESS LIST
Date: August 12, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT
Date: May 01, 2019NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT
Date: May 01, 2019ANSWER OF GLORIA COLLIS
Date: May 14, 2019DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST GTE & TOWN OF LEE
Date: June 03, 2019ORDER ON JOINT MOT TO CONTINUE
Date: October 08, 2019NOTICE OF FILING RELEASE OF DEFERRED PYAMNET LOAN AGREEMENT UNDER TOWN OF LEE
Date: July 02, 2019PTLFI'S NOTICE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: January 08, 2020ORDER SETTING CASE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: July 31, 2019NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: January 30, 2020CERTIFICATE OF SVC OF ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: August 01, 2019PTLIF'S EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 01, 2019PTLIF'S WITNESS LIST
Date: August 01, 2019JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: March 26, 2020PTLIF'S WITNESS LIST
Date: August 19, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: August 21, 2019AGRREED ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: March 27, 2020JOINT MOTION TO COINTINUE NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: September 27, 2019CERTIFICATE OF SVC OF ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: April 02, 2020PLTF'S EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 03, 2020PLTF'S WITNESS LIST
Date: February 03, 2020PLTF'S AMENDED WITNESS LIST
Date: February 18, 2020PTLIF'S MOTION TO PERMIT WITNESS TO TESTIFY BY COMMUNICATION EQIUPMENT
Date: March 17, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE GET FEDERAL CREDIT UNION D/B/A GTE FINANCIAL
Date: October 30, 2020MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLTIF
Date: November 11, 2020PTLF'S EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 02, 2020PTLIF'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER AT TRIAL
Date: March 11, 2021NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL CANCELLATION
Date: April 02, 2020PTLIF'S WITNESS LIST
Date: April 02, 2020CERTIFICATE OF SVC OF ORDER ON THE JOINT MOT TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: April 02, 2020PTLIF'S AMENDED WITNESS LIST
Date: April 16, 2020PTLIF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: June 01, 2020CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PTLIF'S MOT TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: June 10, 2020PTLIF'S NOTICE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: September 21, 2020DEF'S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS FOR EVIDENTIARY HRG
Date: August 11, 2021ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION
Date: August 19, 2021NOTICE OF SUBSTITUION OF COUNSEL WITHIN FIRM (DEF) DESIGNATION OF ATTY'S EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: November 12, 2020NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE & DESGIANTION OF SVC MAIL ADDRESS
Date: January 29, 2021PTLIF'S NOTICE OF READINESS FOR TRIAL
Date: March 11, 2021ORDER GRANTING PTLIF'S MOT FOR SUBSTITUTE OF COUNSEL
Date: February 16, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING PLT'S MOT FOR SUB OF COUNSEL
Date: February 19, 2021NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING
Date: May 12, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: October 13, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTY OF RECORD
Date: May 13, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE & ORDER SETTING EVIDENTARY HRG
Date: June 29, 2021DEF'S NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS FOR EVIDENTIARY HRG
Date: August 10, 2021DEF'S EXHIBIT C
Date: August 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEF'S EXHIBIT C | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 8/12/2021 0900 AM Judge MELISSA OLIN results Disposed on 8/19/2021 | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | DEF'S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS FOR EVIDENTIARY HRG | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | DEF'S NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS FOR EVIDENTIARY HRG | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE & ORDER SETTING EVIDENTARY HRG | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 6/28/2021 0930 AM Judge MELISSA OLIN results Disposed on 6/29/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.