Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ale, Cathy A, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Hardee, Cary Augustus, against Lawson, Chris, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with E BROWNING presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeE BROWNING Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 10, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 10, 2019COMPLAINT OF EJECTMENT
Date: April 10, 2019ANSWER OF DEFENDANT
Date: August 01, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF EJECTMENT | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 8/15/2019 1030 AM Judge E BROWNING III results Disposed on 8/15/2019 | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 8/15/2019 at 1030 AM, MX - Judge E BROWNING III presiding. | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Judge: BROWNING III, E BAILEY Assigned | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF DEFENDANT | |
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 7/19/2019 | |
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.