Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Watson, Wanda, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Ehrhardt, Robert Leroy, against American Integrity Insurance C, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with OLIN, MELISSA GATES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOLIN, MELISSA GATES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 18, 2019COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES & BREACH OF CONTRACT
Date: March 18, 2019PETITIONER'S 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: March 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | NOT OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | DEF'S MOTION FOR EXT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PTLIF'S COMPLAINT | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGANTION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 2019003224 | |
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Active Process SUMMONS | |
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Judge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Case 402019CA000023CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/18/2019 | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.