Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Freedom Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Storrings, Jason A, against Kelley, Alexis, Kelley, William Wayne, Unknown Tenant In Possession O, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with OLIN, MELISSA GATES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOLIN, MELISSA GATES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NTC OF LIS PENDENS
Date: February 28, 2019NOTICE OF LEAD COUNSEL
Date: February 28, 2019NOTICE OF FILING
Date: February 28, 2019ISSUED SUMMONS ALEXIS KELLEY
Date: February 28, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: February 28, 2019MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT
Date: February 28, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE ALEXIS KELLEY
Date: April 05, 2019VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY
Date: February 28, 2019SUMMONS UNKNOWN TENANT
Date: February 28, 2019SUMMONS WILLIAM W KELLEY
Date: February 28, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT-DEFAULT ENTERED
Date: April 04, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE WILLIAM KELLEY
Date: March 29, 2019NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY
Date: April 04, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT
Date: March 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY STATUS
Date: April 04, 2019MOTION FOR SUMMARY FJ OF FORECLOSURE
Date: April 19, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS
Date: April 19, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF TIME & EFFORT
Date: April 19, 2019FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: September 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: April 19, 2019NOTICE OF SALE
Date: September 24, 2019SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY
Date: May 02, 2019NTC OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE
Date: August 06, 2019NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CHOICE LEGAL GROUP PA'S MAILING ADDRESS
Date: August 07, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: August 08, 2019FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: September 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: October 14, 2019MOTION TO CANCEL & RESCHEUDLE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: October 18, 2019RE-NOTICE OF AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: November 13, 2019PTLIF'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO CANCEL & RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: December 05, 2019ORDER DENYING PLTF'S EMERGENCY MOT TO CANCEL & RESCHEDULE SALE
Date: December 06, 2019CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: December 06, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE FOR ORDER
Date: October 04, 2021CORRESPONDENCE TO CHOICE LEGAL GROUP PA RETURNING ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE
Date: September 30, 2021RETURNED MAIL - UNDELIVERABLE ORDER ON PLTIF'S MOT TO VACATE
Date: October 06, 2021RECEIPT OF POST OFFICE DELIVERY OF THE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS
Date: October 13, 2021RECEIPT OF ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE
Date: November 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF POST OFFICE DELIVERY OF THE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL - UNDELIVERABLE ORDER ON PLTIF'S MOT TO VACATE | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE FOR ORDER | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO CHOICE LEGAL GROUP PA RETURNING ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSED | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLTIF'S MOT TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE, DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DOSSOLVE THE LIS PENDENTS & RELEASE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 Total Assessed $50.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received: $50.00 Receipt Number MX 2021007375 | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 assessed at sum $50.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.