Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Roe, Joyce A, Roe, Michael W, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Hartman, Daniel William, against Haripersaud, Geeta, Jaipal, Chandradai, Jaipal, Joodhisthir, Waddraji, Radhika, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with Andrew J. Decker, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndrew J. Decker, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryRp/Mf-Nonhomestead Resid $250,000-More |
Last RefreshedMay 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NTC OF LIS PENDENS
Date: January 26, 2018ISSUED SUMMONS JOODHISTHIR JAIPAL
Date: January 30, 2018ISSUED SUMMONS GEETA HARIPERSAUD
Date: January 30, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number MX 2018010948 | |
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
November 11, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFF OF PUB NOTICE OF SALE | |
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SVC OF ORDER & AMENDED NOT OF SALE | |
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF SALE | |
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE DUE TO COURTHOUSE CLOSURE & RESCHEDULING SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.