Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Weatherspoon, Jhiliah, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Allstate Fire And Casualty Ins, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with DECKER, ANDREW JOSEPH III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDECKER, ANDREW JOSEPH III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 17, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | PLTIF'S NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT | |
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event | DEF'S RESPONSE TO REQ FOR COPIES PURSUANT TO FRCP 1.351(D) | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO | |
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | DEF'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMETNS FROM NON-PARTY | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPO | |
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | DEF'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM NON-PARTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.