Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Calhoun, Dakotah A, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Pearson, Fred Eugene, against Halls Tire And Muffler Center, represented by Martin, Alexander Jesus, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with Andrew J. Decker, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndrew J. Decker, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 16, 2017 |
CategoryNegligence- Premises Liability Commercia |
Last RefreshedMay 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
FILED COMPLAINT
Date: May 16, 2017ISSUED SUMMONS
Date: May 16, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event | RULE 1.720 NOT & CERT | |
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event | PLITF'S NOT OF NON-OBJECTION & REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event | NTC OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY | |
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO | |
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event | PLTIF'S NOT OF SVC OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEF'S 1ST SET OF INT | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Judge: DECKER , ANDREW Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.