Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Dixon, Nora D, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jimenez, Joaquin, Jiminez, Joaquin, in the jurisdiction of Liberty County, FL, . Liberty County, FL Superior Courts with PEDROSO, ACELO ISIDRO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePEDROSO, ACELO ISIDRO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLiberty County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING REPORT OF MAGISTRATE ON FINAL JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE AND ACCEPTANCE OF MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Event FINAL HEARING scheduled on 7/15/2021 at 0230 PM, MX - Judge ACELO PEDROSO presiding. | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR REPORT | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FAMILY MEDIATION INVOICE | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION (amended) | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | HUSBANDS FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.