Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Leon County. This case was filed in Leon County Superior Courts with SMITH, J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMITH, J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 28, 2022 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure Homestead Residential More Than $50,000 But Less Than $250,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLeon County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Before Hearing - Other |
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED SUB TO KAMERON GREEN FOR ZOEY ZEITLIN
Date: July 28, 2022NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND INCORPORATED RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: September 06, 2022NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY
Date: August 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS – PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT MOLLY CAREY on 10/09/2022 | |
October 09, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS – PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT GINA ESPOSITO on 10/09/2022 | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND INCORPORATED RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED SUB TO KAMERON GREEN FOR ZOEY ZEITLIN | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ZOEY ZEITLIN | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED R ZEITLIN | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED SUB TO ROBERT ZEITLIN FOR THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT ZEITLIN | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED K GREEN | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KAMERON GREEN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.