Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Leon County. This case was filed in Leon County Superior Courts with DEMPSEY, ANGELA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDEMPSEY, ANGELA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 24, 2022 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure Non-Homestead Residential More Than $50,000 But Less Than $250,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLeon County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - ALFRED BRUMBLEY
Date: September 29, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - SANDRA ALLEN
Date: September 21, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - DANNY TYE
Date: September 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE | |
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND AD LITEM FEES | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #1752522 | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR 02/13/2024 AT 11:00 AM IN 100, JDG: FORECLOSURE SALE | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | IN REM FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE - Recorded (OR 5909.1524 / 20230066442) | |
December 13, 2023 | Hearing | MOTION HEARING | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE (EF FEE RECEIVED) | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT (CLERK NOTE: DEFAULT NOT PROVIDED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.