Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
American Capital Assurance Corp filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Sfr Services Llc, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Alane C Laboda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlane C Laboda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryCa Insurance Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint was filed by American Capital Assurance Corp. (ACAC) as the subrogee of San Mirage at Bonita Springs Condominium Association, Inc. against Koh Knox, Inc. d/b/a Knox Services. ACAC is a corporation organized under the laws of Florida an...
Voluntary Dismissal
Date: October 27, 2021Return of Service on Summons Served
Date: October 01, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service on Summons Served | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Standing Order in Circuit Civil Cases | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | UCR Case Initiation | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons Submitted for Issuance - Existing Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.