Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Petra Heyden, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Timothy Altieri, against Progressive American Insurance Company, represented by Timothy Altieri, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Keith R Kyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeith R Kyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2021 |
CategoryCa Contracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is a civil cover sheet filed in the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in Lee County, Florida. The plaintiff, Petra Heyden, is suing Progressive American Insurance Company. The estimated amount of the claim is not specifie...
Final Disposition Form
Date: June 17, 2021Voluntary Dismissal
Date: June 16, 2021Return of Service on Summons Served
Date: June 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service on Summons Served | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Standing Order in Civil Cases | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogatories | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.