Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Irene Coombs, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Ashley Cooper, Brittany Panter, against Family Security Insurance Company, represented by Ashley Cooper, Chelsea Maukonen, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Michael T McHugh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael T McHugh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryCa Contracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Irene Coombs against Family Security Insurance Company (also known as "UPC"). The complaint seeks damages in excess of $30,000. Irene Coombs owned a property in Lee County, Florida, which was insured by the defendant. The d...
Minutes
Date: March 28, 2022Claim of Lien
Date: March 09, 2022Order Substituting Counsel
Date: March 03, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 07, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: November 23, 2021Witness List
Date: February 04, 2022Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Date: March 16, 2022Order of Referral to General Magistrate
Date: January 25, 2022Notice of Service
Date: March 10, 2022Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: March 02, 2022Certificate of Completion/Compliance
Date: January 19, 2022Motion for Continuance
Date: February 24, 2022Witness and Exhibit List
Date: February 04, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: January 24, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 16, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: December 23, 2021Subpoena Served
Date: December 21, 2021Subpoena
Date: December 13, 2021Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement
Date: December 17, 2021Subpoena Served
Date: December 23, 2021Motion for Trial De Novo
Date: December 15, 2021Arbitration Report
Date: December 01, 2021Privilege Log
Date: December 13, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: December 07, 2021Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: January 24, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: November 22, 2021Notice of Service
Date: December 13, 2021Arbitration Report
Date: November 22, 2021Notice of Production from Non-Party
Date: December 02, 2021Request for Copies
Date: December 13, 2021Request for Production
Date: November 23, 2021Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement
Date: November 11, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 11, 2021Request for Copies
Date: November 09, 2021Uniform Order Setting Trial/Pretrial/Docket Sounding
Date: September 30, 2021Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena
Date: November 09, 2021Order Scheduling Non-Binding Arbitration
Date: September 27, 2021Privilege Log
Date: August 31, 2021Case Management Plan and Order
Date: July 30, 2021Order/Referral to Nonbinding Arbitration
Date: July 30, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: August 09, 2021Return of Service on Summons Served
Date: July 23, 2021Notice of Non-Binding Arbitration
Date: October 11, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 12, 2021Request for Production
Date: July 26, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: July 26, 2021Motion for Default Judgment
Date: July 23, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 16, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 19, 2021Response to Request For Production
Date: August 31, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 26, 2021Complaint
Date: January 19, 2021Notice of Change of Attorney
Date: August 30, 2021Notice of Change of Attorney
Date: August 24, 2021Order of Reassignment
Date: February 05, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: July 26, 2021Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 23, 2021Notice of Change of Address
Date: April 18, 2021Request for Production
Date: January 19, 2021Standing Order in Civil Cases
Date: January 21, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: February 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2022 | Hearing |
Circuit Civil Court
Judge: McHugh, Michael T |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes | |
March 17, 2022 | Hearing |
CANCELLED-Other Circuit Civil Court
Judge: Bocelli, Kimberly Davis |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Hearing | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Claim of Lien | |
March 07, 2022 | Hearing |
CANCELLED-Other Circuit Civil Court
Judge: McHugh, Michael T |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Substituting Counsel | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.