Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
John Rawlins, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Margaret Garner, against United Services Automobile Association, represented by Terrence Lavy, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Alane C Laboda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlane C Laboda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryCa Insurance Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is a civil cover sheet filed in the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in Lee County, Florida. The plaintiff, John Rawlins, is suing the defendant, United Services Automobile Association. The estimated amount of the claim ...
Notice of Production from Non-Party
Date: August 13, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: December 15, 2021Certificate of Non-Objection
Date: December 16, 2021Response and Objection to Request for Production
Date: December 15, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: December 15, 2021Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial
Date: February 16, 2021Notice of Non-Binding Arbitration
Date: December 13, 2021Order Cancelling Hearing
Date: December 14, 2021Correspondence
Date: February 16, 2021Order to Show Cause
Date: December 08, 2021Order/Referral to Nonbinding Arbitration
Date: October 22, 2021Uniform Order Setting Trial/Pretrial/Docket Sounding
Date: October 22, 2021Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement
Date: October 05, 2021Case Management Plan and Order
Date: July 01, 2021Order on Motion
Date: May 10, 2021Correspondence
Date: May 10, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 13, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 05, 2021Request for Production
Date: March 05, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 16, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: March 05, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 09, 2021Motionto Determine
Date:Notice of Appearance
Date: February 04, 2021Designation of E-Mail Address
Date: January 19, 2021Return of Service on Summons Served
Date: January 25, 2021Standing Order in Civil Cases
Date: January 20, 2021Request for Production
Date: January 19, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 19, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: January 19, 2021Complaint
Date: January 19, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: January 19, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2021 | Hearing |
CANCELLED-Other Circuit Civil Court
Judge: Laboda, Alane C |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Non-Objection | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Response and Objection to Request for Production | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Cancelling Hearing | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Binding Arbitration | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order/Referral to Nonbinding Arbitration | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Uniform Order Setting Trial/Pretrial/Docket Sounding |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.