Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Samuel Schultz, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Preston Scheiner, against Brian Bolton, Jupiter Industries Llc, William Fuller, represented by Michael Logan, Preston Scheiner, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Keith R Kyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeith R Kyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryCa Auto Negligence |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint was filed in the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in Lee County, Florida. The plaintiff, Samuel George Schultz, is taking legal action against Jupiter Industries LLC and William James Fuller, who are named as defendants ...
Exhibit List
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Non-Binding Arbitration
Date: March 11, 2022Uniform Order Setting Trial/Pretrial/Docket Sounding
Date: March 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Binding Arbitration | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Uniform Order Setting Trial/Pretrial/Docket Sounding | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
January 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Deposition | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Non-Objection | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Amend | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request For Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.