Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cindy Nalyd, Ric Nalyd, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Margaret Garner, against Asi Preferred Insurance Corp, represented by Margaret Garner, Tracy Jurgus, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Leigh Frizzell Hayes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeigh Frizzell Hayes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryCa Insurance Claims |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is a civil cover sheet filed in the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in Lee County, Florida. The plaintiffs, Ric Nalyd and Cindy Nalyd, are suing the defendant, Asi Preferred Insurance Corp. The estimated amount of the c...
Notice of Cancellation of Deposition
Date: March 18, 2022Mediation Report
Date: March 21, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: March 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Deposition | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Uniform Order Setting Trial/Pretrial/Docket Sounding | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Production from Non-Party | |
March 14, 2022 | Hearing |
CANCELLED-Other Circuit Civil Court
Judge: Hayes, Leigh Frizzell |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate/Certification of Authority | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Hearing | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.