Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ay'Lah Jackson filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Joseph C Fuller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph C Fuller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryGuardianship |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Revoking Letters of Guardianship | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Adopting Report & Recommendations | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Report & Recommendation of General Magistrate | |
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | MinutesOrder to Show Cause Hearing | |
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Guardianship Audit Deficiency Notice | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Adopting Report & Recommendations | |
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Report & Recommendation of General MagistrateContinued Hearing 8/8/19 10:30 AM | |
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.