Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Michael Churney, Paradise Docks, Sherwood Condominium Association Inc, Unknown Party 1, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Geoffrey H. Gentile presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeoffrey H. Gentile Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryCa Non-Homestead Residential Foreclosure 2: $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC against Michael Churney, Paradise Docks, Sherwood Condominium Association, Inc., and unknown parties claiming an interest in the property. The complaint states that Michael Churn...
Assignment of Bid
Date: April 28, 2017Unsigned Answer
Date: January 20, 2017Requestof Funds
Date: August 04, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Check Mailed from Civil | |
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Check Mailed from Civil check on hold in Lisa Maxim's office | |
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk Request for Disbursement of Funds | |
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Requestof Funds | |
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Order to Disburse Funds | |
August 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Circuit Civil Court
Judge: Gentile, Geoffrey Henry |
|
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Minutes | |
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing08/01/17 @ 9:00 | |
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Check Mailed from Civil |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.