Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bayview Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Catherine Malcolm, Desmond Malcolm, Lee County, Old Florida Bank, Unknown Beneficiaries Of Catherine Jenni, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2007 |
CategoryCa Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a mortgage foreclosure case filed by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC against Desmond Malcolm and Catherine Malcolm. The complaint is divided into two counts.
Count I is for the re-establishment of a lost promissory note under Section ...
Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 19, 2008Voluntary Dismissal
Date: April 16, 2009Amended Complaint
Date: May 06, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing11/21/08@1pm | |
August 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Lost Summons-Return of Service Attached | |
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Minutes | |
June 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing7-18-08 @ 8:30am | |
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment | |
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Dropping Party | |
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion for Default and Default (Denied- No Service Return) | |
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attorneys Time | |
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attorneys Fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.