Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Douglas Rossi, Tabitha Rossi, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bruce Scheiner, Demrie Graham, against John Schumacher, Sharon Bugar Schumacher, represented by Bruce Scheiner, Demrie Graham, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with R. Thomas Corbin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeR. Thomas Corbin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryCa Auto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Order of Dismissal
Date: August 04, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Images Purged | |
August 06, 2010 | Hearing |
CANCELLED-Case Dismissed CADR Abatement
Judge: Corbin, R Thomas |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal | |
July 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution and Hearing Notice | |
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
May 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Lack of Prosecution | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Mediator Report | |
March 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Stipulation to Appoint Mediator and Set Mediation | |
March 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Order Appointing and Directing Mediation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.