Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Indymac Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Luis Masso, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Unknown Spouse Of Luis Masso, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryCa Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint was filed by INDYMAC BANK F.S.B against Luis Masso and unknown individuals in possession of the subject property. The complaint consists of two counts.
Count I is an action to establish a promissory note under Section 673.3091 of the...
Answer
Date: March 12, 2008Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment
Date: September 15, 2009Amended Complaint
Date: January 31, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Referred to Collections Indymac Bank FSB referred to Collections Agency through automated process | |
September 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Original Mortgage Documents Returned to Plaintiff | |
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment | |
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
August 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Check Mailed from Civil #13366 | |
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Clerk Request for Disbursement of Funds | |
July 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Orderagreed order vacating certificate of sale & setting aside foreclosure sale | |
July 18, 2008 | Hearing |
Judge: Certificate of Title |
|
July 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion to Set Aside | |
July 07, 2008 | Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.