Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Accredited Home Lenders Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Gina Choquette, Neil Porter, Unknown Spouse Of Gina Choquette, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Alane C Laboda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlane C Laboda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryCa Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Accredited Home Lenders, Inc., a California corporation, against Neil Porter, Gina Choquette, and unknown tenants. The complaint states that on April 27, 2006, Neil Porter and Gina Choquette executed a ...
Complaint
Date: December 28, 2007Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 17, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned Not Served | |
December 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Issued forwarded to LCSD | |
November 18, 2008 | Hearing | ||
November 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title Issued | |
November 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements Issued | |
November 05, 2008 | Hearing | ||
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Sale | |
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale Issued | |
October 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Final Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.