Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bank Of New York, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Bank Of America Na, Magdala Thelisma, Oscar Chavarria, Unknown Heirs, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Elisabeth Adams presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElisabeth Adams Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryCa Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by the Bank of New York as trustee for the Certificateholder S CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2006-OA 12 against Magdala Thelisma, Oscar Chavarria, Unknown Tenant I, Unknown Tenant II, and Bank of Amer...
Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale
Date: January 13, 2012Chavarria, Oscar - Summons (30 day) IssuedSF
Date: December 28, 2007Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: October 02, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned Served | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Issued frwd to LCSD | |
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Order for Writ of Possession | |
March 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion for Writ of PossessionAmended | |
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Check Mailed from Civil | |
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Unsigned Order with Judicial Notation | |
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion for Writ of Possession | |
February 24, 2012 | Hearing |
Certificate of Title
Judge: No, Judge Assigned |
|
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title Issued | |
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.