Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Dulce Iglesias, Oscar Farinas, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryCa Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Motion to Strike
Date: March 31, 2008Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 25, 2008Motion to Withdraw as Counsel
Date: November 13, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title (Recorded) | |
June 02, 2009 | Hearing | ||
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements Issued | |
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title IssuedNeed $0.70 doc stamps | |
May 22, 2009 | Hearing | ||
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale Issued | |
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Sale | |
April 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale Issued, Copy to Gulf Coast Business Review | |
April 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Final Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.