Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Terry Smayda, Unknown Spouse Of Terry A Smayda, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryCa Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a mortgage foreclosure action filed by Wells Fargo Bank, NA against Terry A. Smayda and other unknown parties. The complaint states that on December 30, 2003, a promissory note and mortgage were executed and delivered, securing the ...
Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 16, 2009Answer
Date: February 18, 2008Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 23, 2008Amended Answer
Date: February 21, 2008Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 24, 2008Complaint
Date: December 28, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Original Mortgage Documents Returned to Plaintiff | |
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
February 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
January 14, 2009 | Hearing |
Judge: Foreclosure Sale |
|
January 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Foreclosure Sale Cancellation Verification | |
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Foreclosure Sale Cancellation Verification | |
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Sale | |
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale Issued, Copy to Gulf Coast Business Review |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.